+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 2, 2010 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
On February 23, 2010 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 17, 2010 in the House:
- Referred: Public Safety
On January 27, 2010 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 26, 2010 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor