+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- Referred: Select Committee on State and Local Governments
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 21, 2016 in the House:
- Referred: Elections
On January 7, 2016 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 6, 2016 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 14, 2015 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor