+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 25, 2016 in the House:
- Action Postponed
- Executive Session Continued
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Referred: Select Committee on Social Services
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 10 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- Referred: Children and Families
On January 7, 2016 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 6, 2016 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 14, 2015 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor