+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On May 2, 2006 in the Senate:
- Second Rd/Refer: Pensions, Veteran Affairs & General Law
On May 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 27, 2006 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 122 NOES: 30 PRESENT: 1
On April 26, 2006 in the House:
- Perfected
- HCS Adopted
On April 19, 2006 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On April 18, 2006 in the House:
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On April 12, 2006 in the House:
- Referred: Rules Pursuant to Rule 25
- HCS Reported Do Pass
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 29, 2006 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 7, 2006 in the House:
- Referred: Special Committee on General Laws
On February 20, 2006 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 16, 2006 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (59)
Type:
Primary Sponsor