+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On May 1, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar
On March 18, 2020 in the House:
- Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar
On February 26, 2020 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On February 18, 2020 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 11, 2020 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 16, 2020 in the House:
- Referred: Local Government
On January 9, 2020 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 8, 2020 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 18, 2019 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendment
3479H02.02H
Distributed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor