+ − Actions (32)
On June 28, 2002 in the House:
- Delivered to Secretary of State
- Approved by Governor
On May 28, 2002 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 28, 2002 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 28, 2002 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
- Bill Typed as Truly Agreed
On May 10, 2002 in the House:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 149 NOES: 5
- House Concurs - SCS AS AMENDED ADOPTED AYES: 150 NOES: 2
On May 9, 2002 in the House:
- Reported to the House with... - SCS AS AMENDED
On May 9, 2002 in the Senate:
- Third Read and Passed with Amendments - SA 1 ADOPTED YEAS: 31 NAYS: 0
On May 8, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
- Executive Session Held
- Public Hearing Held
On May 7, 2002 in the Senate:
- Referred: Budget Control Committee
- SCS Adopted
- Taken Up for Third Reading
On May 1, 2002 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar
- Taken Up for Third Reading - SA 1 ADOPTED/MOTION TO ADOPT WITHDRAWN/BILL WILL HOLD PLACE ON CALENDAR
On April 15, 2002 in the Senate:
- SCS Reported Do Pass-Placed on 3rd Read Consent Calendar
On April 9, 2002 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - SCS VOTED DO PASS CONSENT
- Public Hearing Held
On April 8, 2002 in the Senate:
- Second Rd/Refer: Local Government & Economic Development
On April 5, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 5, 2002 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 144 NOES: 0
On March 21, 2002 in the House:
- Reported Perfected and Printed
- Perfected by Consent
On March 14, 2002 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass by Consent
On March 13, 2002 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed - VOTED DO PASS CONSENT
On March 6, 2002 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 21, 2002 in the House:
- Referred: Municipal Corporations
On February 7, 2002 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 6, 2002 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor