+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On June 25, 2008 in the House:
- Delivered to Secretary of State - THIS BILL BECOMES EFFECTIVE AUGUST 28, 2008, EXCEPT FOR SECTION 82.020 WHICH HAS A JUNE 25, 2008 EFFECTIVE DATE
- Approved by Governor
On May 29, 2008 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 29, 2008 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 29, 2008 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 16, 2008 in the House:
- Emergency Clause Adopted on Truly Agreed to Bill - AYES: 132 NOES: 6 PRESENT: 1
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 136 NOES: 4
- House Concurs - SCS AS AMENDED ADOPTED AYES: 135 NOES: 4
On May 12, 2008 in the House:
- Reported to the House with... - SCS AS AMENDED
On May 12, 2008 in the Senate:
- Emergency Clause Adopted - YEAS: 33 NAYS: 0
- Third Read and Passed with Amendments - SA 1 ADOPTED YEAS: 33 NAYS: 0
- SCS Adopted
On April 10, 2008 in the Senate:
- SCS Reported Do Pass-Placed on 3rd Read Consent Calendar
On April 9, 2008 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - SCS VOTED DO PASS COMMITTEE VOTE RECONSIDERED SCS #2 VOTED DO PASS CONSENT
- Public Hearing Held
On April 8, 2008 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - WEDNESDAY, APRIL 9, 2008, 2:00PM, SENATE LOUNGE
On April 7, 2008 in the Senate:
- Second Rd/Refer: Economic Development,Tourism & Local Gov
On April 3, 2008 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 2, 2008 in the House:
- Emergency Clause Adopted - AYES: 133 NOES: 18 PRESENT: 1
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 148 NOES: 0
On March 27, 2008 in the House:
- Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules
On March 12, 2008 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On March 10, 2008 in the House:
- Referred: Rules Pursuant to Rule 25
- HCS Reported Do Pass by Consent
On March 4, 2008 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Executive Session Completed
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 19, 2008 in the House:
- Referred: Special Committee on Government Affairs
On January 24, 2008 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 23, 2008 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor