+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (32)
On June 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Secretary of State
- Approved by Governor
On May 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 25, 2021 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 7, 2021 in the House:
- House Message
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 147 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
- House Adopts - SCS AYES: 147 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
- Taken Up
On May 4, 2021 in the House:
- Reported to the House with... - SCS
On May 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 34 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- SCS Adopted
- Taken Up for Third Reading
On April 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Appropriations
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Wednesday, April 28, upon morning recess, SCR 2
- Public Hearing Held
- Executive Session Held
- SCS Voted Do Pass
- SCS Reported Do Pass
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 27, 2021 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 98 NOES: 43 PRESENT: 3
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Perfected
- HCS Adopted
- Title of Bill - Agreed To
- Taken Up for Perfection
On April 26, 2021 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 23 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 1, 2021 in the House:
- Referred: Budget
On February 25, 2021 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 24, 2021 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor