+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On April 23, 2014 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Rules
On April 10, 2014 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- HCS Voted Do Pass
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing Continued
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Referred: General Laws
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor