+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On April 5, 2012 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On March 27, 2012 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
On March 26, 2012 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
On March 19, 2012 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Special Standing Committee on Disability Services
On February 22, 2012 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 21, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor