+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On April 28, 2010 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 27, 2010 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - WEDNESDAY, APRIL 28, 2010, 12:00P.M.SENATE LOUNGE
On April 26, 2010 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Jobs, Economic Development, and Local Government
On April 22, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 22, 2010 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 98 NOES: 59 PRESENT: 0
On April 21, 2010 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
- Reported Do Pass
On April 20, 2010 in the House:
- HCS Adopted - AYES: 105 NOES: 54
- Perfected - AYES: 107 NOES: 54
- Referred: Fiscal Review
On April 15, 2010 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On April 14, 2010 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
On April 1, 2010 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- HCS Voted Do Pass
On March 16, 2010 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 17, 2010 in the House:
- Referred: Special Standing Committee on General Laws
On January 25, 2010 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 21, 2010 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor