+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (25)
On June 19, 2008 in the House:
- Delivered to Secretary of State
- Approved by Governor
On May 29, 2008 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 29, 2008 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 29, 2008 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 16, 2008 in the Senate:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - YEAS: 34 NAYS: 0
On April 15, 2008 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass-Placed on Third Read Consent Calendar
- Executive Session Held
On April 9, 2008 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 8, 2008 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - WEDNESDAY, APRIL 9, 2008, 12:30PM, SENATE LOUNGE
On April 7, 2008 in the Senate:
- Second Rd/Refer: Pensions, Veteran Affairs & General Law
On April 3, 2008 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 2, 2008 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 152 NOES: 0
On March 27, 2008 in the House:
- Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules
On March 12, 2008 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On March 5, 2008 in the House:
- Referred: Rules Pursuant to Rule 25
- Reported Do Pass by Consent
On March 4, 2008 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Executive Session Completed
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 28, 2008 in the House:
- Referred: Special Committee on Veterans
On January 24, 2008 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 23, 2008 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor