+ − Actions (25)
On July 2, 2002 in the House:
- Delivered to Secretary of State
- Approved by Governor
On May 28, 2002 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 28, 2002 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 28, 2002 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
- Bill Typed as Truly Agreed
On May 6, 2002 in the House:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 153 NOES: 0
- House Concurs - SCS ADOPTED AYES: 152 NOES: 0
On May 3, 2002 in the House:
- Reported to the House with... - SCS
On May 3, 2002 in the Senate:
- Third Read and Passed - YEAS: 26 NAYS: 0
- SCS Adopted
On April 15, 2002 in the Senate:
- SCS Reported Do Pass-Placed on 3rd Read Consent Calendar
On April 9, 2002 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - SCS VOTED DO PASS CONSENT
- Public Hearing Held
On April 3, 2002 in the Senate:
- Second Read/Referred: Aging, Families & Mental Health
On April 2, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 2, 2002 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 154 NOES: 0
On March 11, 2002 in the House:
- Reported Perfected and Printed
- Perfected by Consent
On February 27, 2002 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass by Consent
On February 26, 2002 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed - VOTED DO PASS CONSENT
On February 19, 2002 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 14, 2002 in the House:
- Referred: Education-Elementary and Secondary
On February 5, 2002 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 4, 2002 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor