+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (10)
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - No Action Taken
On March 13, 2014 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Rules
On March 12, 2014 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- HCS Voted Do Pass
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Referred: General Laws
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor