+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Wednesday, April 13, 2016, 8:15 a.m., SCR 1
On March 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate Transportation, Infrastructure, and Public Safety
On March 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 15, 2016 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 139 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
- Taken Up
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules
On March 1, 2016 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent - AYES: 6 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Referred: Select Committee on Rules
- Reported Do Pass by Consent - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Executive Session Completed
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 12, 2016 in the House:
- Referred: Transportation
On January 7, 2016 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 6, 2016 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 11, 2015 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Votes (2)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor