+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On April 24, 2014 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass - not Consent
- Rules - Voted Do Pass - not Consent
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Referred: Rules
- Reported Do Pass by Consent
On March 4, 2014 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Executive Session Completed
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Referred: Veterans
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time