+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (29)
On June 21, 2006 in the House:
- Delivered to Secretary of State
- Approved by Governor
On May 26, 2006 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 26, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 26, 2006 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 5, 2006 in the House:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 148 NOES: 0
- House Concurs - SCS ADOPTED AYES: 147 NOES: 1
On May 3, 2006 in the House:
- Reported to the House with... - SCS
On May 3, 2006 in the Senate:
- Third Read and Passed - YEAS: 33 NAYS: 0
- SCS Adopted
On April 12, 2006 in the Senate:
- SCS Reported Do Pass-Placed on 3rd Read Consent Calendar
- Executive Session Held
- Public Hearing Held
On April 6, 2006 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Transportation
- Public Hearing Scheduled - SENATE LOUNGE-TUESDAY, APRIL 11, 2006-12:00PM
On April 3, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 3, 2006 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 148 NOES: 0
On March 31, 2006 in the House:
- Pursuant to Rule 44 - HBs for Perfection Consent - This bill has remained on the HB for Perfection Consent Calendar for five legislative days withoutany objection, and any committee substitutes and committee amendments are hereby adopted by consent
On March 16, 2006 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On March 14, 2006 in the House:
- Referred: Rules Pursuant to Rule 25
- HCS Reported Do Pass by Consent
On March 8, 2006 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Executive Session Completed
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 23, 2006 in the House:
- Referred: Veterans
On February 15, 2006 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 14, 2006 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (51)
Type:
Primary Sponsor