+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (32)
On July 12, 2012 in the House:
- Vetoed by Governor
- Delivered to Secretary of State
On May 30, 2012 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 30, 2012 in the House:
- Constitutional Objection Filed
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 18, 2012 in the House:
- House Concurs - SCS ADOPTED AYES: 114 NOES: 037
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 106 NOES: 039
On May 15, 2012 in the House:
- Reported to the House with... - SCS
On May 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- SCS Adopted
- Third Read and Passed - YEAS: 25 NAYS: 08
On May 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held
- SCS Reported Do Pass
On May 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On May 4, 2012 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - TUESDAY, MAY 8,2012, 9:00 A.M., SCR 1
On May 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Committee - HEALTH, MENTAL HEALTH, SENIORS AND FAMILIES
On May 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence
On April 26, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 26, 2012 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 123 NOES 029
On April 24, 2012 in the House:
- HCS Adopted
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1 TO HSA 1 FOR HA 1, HSA 1 FOR HA 1, AS AMENDED
On April 12, 2012 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On March 27, 2012 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
On March 7, 2012 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- HCS Voted Do Pass
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 20, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Judiciary
On February 17, 2012 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 16, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time