+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (25)
On April 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Tuesday, April 26, 2016, 12:00pm, SCR 1
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate Small Business, Insurance, and Industry
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 12, 2016 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 84 NOES: 68 PRESENT: 0
- Taken Up
On April 11, 2016 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 6 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On April 7, 2016 in the House:
- Referred: Fiscal Review
On April 6, 2016 in the House:
- Taken Up
- HCS Adopted
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1 adopted
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 5 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Referred: Select Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations
- Reported Do Pass with Amendments - HCA 1 AYES: 8 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass with Amendments
- Executive Session Completed
On January 20, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 12, 2016 in the House:
- Referred: Employment Security
On January 7, 2016 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 6, 2016 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 11, 2015 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendments (6)
5036H02.01H
Distributed
5036H02.02H
Adopted
5036H02.03H
Distributed
5036H02.04H
Distributed
5036H02.06H
Distributed
5036H01.06H
Distributed
+ − Vote
April 12, 2016: HB 1756
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor