+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (37)
On June 24, 2010 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
- Delivered to Secretary of State
On May 25, 2010 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 25, 2010 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 25, 2010 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 5, 2010 in the House:
- Reported to the House with... - SS AS AMENDED
- House Concurs - SS AS AMENDED ADOPTED AYES: 145 NOES: 9
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 148 NOES: 7
On May 4, 2010 in the Senate:
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Senate Substitute Offered
- Placed on Informal Calendar - SCS, SS/SCS PENDING
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- SS Adopted
- Third Read and Passed with Amendments - SA 1 ADOPTED YEAS: 31 NAYS: 2
On May 3, 2010 in the Senate:
- SCS Reported Do Pass
On April 22, 2010 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - SCS VOTED DO PASS
On April 21, 2010 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Scheduled - THURSDAY, APRIL 22, 2010 9:30 AM, PERSHING GALLERY CONFERENCE ROOM
On April 20, 2010 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 15, 2010 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - TUESDAY, APRIL 20, 2010,1:30P.M,SENATE LOUNGE
- Executive Session Scheduled - TUESDAY, APRIL 20, 2010, 1:30P.M.,SENATE LOUNGE
On March 18, 2010 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy, and the Environment
On February 18, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On February 18, 2010 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 111 NOES: 40 PRESENT: 0
On February 17, 2010 in the House:
- HCS Adopted
- Perfected - AYES: 86 NOES: 69 PRESENT: 0
On February 15, 2010 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On February 11, 2010 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- HCS Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
On February 9, 2010 in the House:
- Executive Session - No Action Taken
On February 2, 2010 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 26, 2010 in the House:
- Referred: Utilities
On January 25, 2010 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 21, 2010 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor