+ − Actions (46)
On July 12, 2002 in the House:
- Delivered to Secretary of State
- Vetoed by Governor
On May 28, 2002 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 28, 2002 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 28, 2002 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
- Bill Typed as Truly Agreed
On May 17, 2002 in the House:
- House Submits Conference Committee Report
- Conference Committee Substitute
- House Adopts Conference Committee Report - AYES: 150 NOES: 0
- House Adopts Conference Committee Substitute
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 145 NOES: 2
- Emergency Clause Defeated - AYES: 4 NOES: 150 PRESENT: 1
On May 17, 2002 in the Senate:
- Senate Submits Conference Committee Report
- Conference Committee Substitute
- Senate Adopts Conference Committee Report - YEAS: 32 NAYS: 0
- Senate Adopts Conference Committee Substitute
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - YEAS: 29 NAYS: 0
On May 15, 2002 in the House:
- House Conference Committee Appointed - REPRESENTATIVES RANSDALL, RELFORD, WILLOUGHBY, HEGEMAN AND RECTOR
On May 15, 2002 in the Senate:
- Senate Conference Committee Appointed - SENATORS STEELMAN, KLINDT, CAUTHORN, JOHNSON AND CASKEY
- Senate Refuses to Recede, Grants Conference
On May 15, 2002 in the House:
- House Refuses to Concur, Requests Senate to Recede or Grant Conference
On May 14, 2002 in the Senate:
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Senate Substitute Offered
- Third Read and Passed with Amendments - SA 1, SA 2, SA 3, SA 1 TO SA 4, SA 2 TO SA 4, SA 4AS AMENDED, SA 5 ADOPTED YEAS: 24 NAYS: 1
- SS Adopted
- Emergency Clause Adopted - YEAS: 23 NAYS: 1
On May 14, 2002 in the House:
- Reported to the House with... - SS AS AMENDED
On May 13, 2002 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar
On May 8, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
- Executive Session Held
- Public Hearing Held
On May 6, 2002 in the Senate:
- Referred: Budget Control Committee
On May 3, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
On April 11, 2002 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - VOTED DO PASS
On April 9, 2002 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 4, 2002 in the Senate:
- Second Read/Referred: Commerce and Environment
On March 25, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 21, 2002 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 141 NOES: 0
On March 20, 2002 in the House:
- Reported Perfected and Printed
On March 19, 2002 in the House:
- Perfected
On March 7, 2002 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass
On February 21, 2002 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed - VOTED DO PASS
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 14, 2002 in the House:
- Referred: Environment and Energy
On February 4, 2002 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 31, 2002 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor