+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On March 18, 2010 in the Senate:
- Second Rd/Refer: Vet Affairs, Pensions,& Urban Affairs
On March 4, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 4, 2010 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 153 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On February 22, 2010 in the House:
- Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules - This bill has remained on the HB for Perfection Consent Calendar for five legislative days withoutany objection, and any committee substitutes and committee amendments are hereby adopted by consent
On February 11, 2010 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent
On February 9, 2010 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Reported Do Pass by Consent
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
On February 1, 2010 in the House:
- Referred: Veterans
On January 21, 2010 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 20, 2010 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor