+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On April 18, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- Referred: Emerging Issues
On January 7, 2016 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 6, 2016 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 11, 2015 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor