+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Held
On April 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Wednesday, April 6, 2022, 9:00 a.m., Senate Committee Room 1
On March 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Progress and Development
On March 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 133 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 1
- Taken Up for Third Reading
On March 3, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar
On February 28, 2022 in the House:
- Perfected
- HCS Adopted
- Taken Up
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- Taken Up for Perfection
- Title of Bill - Agreed To
- Laid Over
On February 10, 2022 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 2
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 1, 2022 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On January 31, 2022 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On January 24, 2022 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 6, 2022 in the House:
- Referred: Special Committee on Urban Issues
- Read Second Time
On January 5, 2022 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 1, 2021 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor