+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Jobs, Economic Development, and Local Government
On March 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 28, 2012 in the House:
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Laid Over - Third Reading
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 143 NOES: 2
- Emergency Clause Adopted
On March 27, 2012 in the House:
- Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules
On March 20, 2012 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent
On March 5, 2012 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass by Consent
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
On February 27, 2012 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
- Executive Session Completed
- HCS Voted Do Pass - Consent
On February 23, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Special Standing Committee on Disability Services
On February 16, 2012 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 15, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor