+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (37)
On June 23, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by Governor
- Delivered to Secretary of State
On May 30, 2014 in the House:
- Delivered to Governor
On May 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 30, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 13, 2014 in the House:
- Taken Up
- House Adopts - SS SCS ADOPTED AYES: 125 NOES: 14 PRESENT: 1
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 127 NOES: 14 PRESENT: 1
- House Message
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Senate Substitute Offered
On May 7, 2014 in the House:
- Reported to the House with... - SS SCS
On May 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- SS Adopted
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 28 NOES: 4
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- SCS Reported Do Pass
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - SCS voted do pass
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Wednesday, April 23, 2014, upon evening recess/adjournment, Senate Lounge
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy, and the Environment
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 139 NOES: 5
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- Taken Up for Perfection
- HCS Adopted
- Perfected
On March 6, 2014 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Rules
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- HCS Voted Do Pass
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Referred: General Laws
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time