+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Referred: Select Committee on State and Local Governments
- Reported Do Pass with Amendments - HCA 1 AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On February 23, 2016 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass with Amendments
- Executive Session Completed
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 14, 2016 in the House:
- Referred: Transportation
On January 7, 2016 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 6, 2016 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 11, 2015 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendments (6)
5126H02.06H
Distributed
5126H02.01H
Distributed
5126H02.02H
Distributed
5126H02.03H
Distributed
5126H02.04H
Distributed
5126H01.03H
Distributed