+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (41)
On May 6, 2014 in the House:
- Reported to the House with... - SA 1
On May 6, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Third Read and Passed with Amendments - SA 1 ADOPTED AYES: 30
On May 5, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Monday, May 5, 2014, 2:45pm, Pershing Conference Room
- Public Hearing Held
- Executive Session Held - Voted do pass
On May 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Taken Up for Third Reading - SA 1 adopted
- Referred: Senate Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight
On April 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - VOTED DO PASS
- Reported Do Pass
- Placed on Informal Calendar
On April 29, 2014 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Scheduled - Wednesday, April 30, 2014, 1:15pm, Senate Committee Room 1
On April 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred: Senate Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
On April 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held
- Voted Do Pass
On April 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Wednesday, April 9, 2014, Noon or upon Noon recess, Senate Lounge
On April 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate Jobs, Economic Development, and Local Government
On March 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
- Reported Do Pass
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 120 NOES: 11
On March 26, 2014 in the House:
- Taken Up for Perfection
- HCS Adopted
- Perfected
- Referred: Fiscal Review
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On March 3, 2014 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Rules
On February 27, 2014 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- HCS Voted Do Pass
On February 18, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 12, 2014 in the House:
- Referred: General Laws
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Amendments (2)
5605H02.01F
Distributed
5605H02.01H
Returned
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor