+ − Actions (22)
On May 17, 2002 in the House:
- Placed on Informal Calendar
On May 16, 2002 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass
On May 14, 2002 in the Senate:
- Referred: Budget Control Committee
On May 13, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
On May 8, 2002 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - VOTED DO PASS
- Public Hearing Held
On May 6, 2002 in the Senate:
- Second Read/Referred: Civil & Criminal Jurisprudence
On April 25, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 25, 2002 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 99 NOES: 50
On April 23, 2002 in the House:
- Reported Perfected and Printed
On April 22, 2002 in the House:
- Taken Up for Perfection
- HS Adopted in House
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1, HA 3, HA 5, HA 7, HA 18, HA 21 ADOPTED
On April 18, 2002 in the House:
- Laid Over - HA 1, HA 3, HA 5, HA 7 ADOPTED/HSA 1 FOR HA 8, HA 8 AND HS AS AMENDED PENDING
- House Substitute Offered
- Taken Up for Perfection
On April 8, 2002 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass
On February 20, 2002 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed - HCS VOTED DO PASS
On February 13, 2002 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 6, 2002 in the House:
- Referred: Spec Comm on Sportsmanship, Safety, & Firearms
On January 31, 2002 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 30, 2002 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor