+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On May 4, 2006 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar
- Reported Do Pass
- Executive Session Held
- Public Hearing Held
On May 3, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred: Governmental Accountability and Fisc Oversight
On May 2, 2006 in the Senate:
- SCS Reported Do Pass
- Executive Session Held - SCS VOTED DO PASS
- Public Hearing Held
On April 27, 2006 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - SENATE LOUNGE-TUESDAY, MAY 2, 2006-8:30AM
On April 24, 2006 in the Senate:
- Second Rd/Refer: Commerce, Energy, and the Environment
On April 20, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 20, 2006 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 108 NOES: 44 PRESENT: 1
On April 19, 2006 in the House:
- Perfected
On April 5, 2006 in the House:
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On April 4, 2006 in the House:
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
On April 3, 2006 in the House:
- Referred: Rules Pursuant to Rule 25
- Reported Do Pass
On March 8, 2006 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 1, 2006 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 23, 2006 in the House:
- Referred: Utilities
On February 13, 2006 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 9, 2006 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor