+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 27, 2012 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
On March 20, 2012 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Transportation
On February 15, 2012 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 14, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (35)
Type:
Primary Sponsor