+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On May 9, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar
On April 28, 2022 in the House:
- Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar
On April 11, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar
On April 6, 2022 in the House:
- Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar
On March 23, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar
On March 7, 2022 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 17 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On February 8, 2022 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 1, 2022 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 27, 2022 in the House:
- Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education
On January 6, 2022 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 5, 2022 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 1, 2021 in the House:
- Prefiled