+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (88)
On July 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by Governor
- Delivered to Secretary of State
On May 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 18, 2022 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 10, 2022 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 111 NOES: 26 PRESENT: 0
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 6 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
- House Submits Conference Committee Report
- House Adopts Conference Committee Report - AYES: 115 NOES: 20 PRESENT: 0
- House Message
- Emergency Clause Adopted - AYES: 120 NOES: 26 PRESENT: 0
On May 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Submits Conference Committee Report
- Senate Adopts Conference Committee Report - AYES: 28 NOES: 6 PRESENT: 0
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 28 NOES: 6 PRESENT: 0
- Emergency Clause Adopted on Truly Agreed to Bill - AYES: 29 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 0
- Senate Message
On May 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Message
- Taken Up
On May 5, 2022 in the House:
- Conferees to Exceed Differences - Sections 348.491 and 348.493
- House Message
- House Distributes Conference Committee Report
- Referred: Fiscal Review
On May 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Conferees to Exceed Differences - Specific to the sunset on the tax credits and provisions for speciality crops in sections 348.491 and 348.493 to clarify provisions.
On May 3, 2022 in the House:
- House Message
- Conferees to Exceed Differences - Specific to the sunset on the tax credits.
On May 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Taken Up
- Senate Message
On May 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Conference Committee Appointed - SENATORS BEAN, BERNSKOETTER, HOSKINS, RAZER, WASHINGTON
On April 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Message
On April 28, 2022 in the House:
- House Conference Committee Appointed - REPRESENTATIVES POLLITT(52), RONE, CHIPMAN, MCCREERY, BROWN(70)
- House Message
On April 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Senate Refuses to Recede, Grants Conference
On April 19, 2022 in the House:
- House Message
- House Refuses to Adopt, Requests Senate to Recede or Grant Conference
- Taken Up
On April 14, 2022 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 5 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On April 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held
- Voted Do Pass
- Reported Do Pass
- Taken Up
- Third Read and Passed with Amendments - SS SCS, as amended. AYES: 25 NOES: 7 PRESENT: 0
On April 7, 2022 in the House:
- Referred: Fiscal Review
On April 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Emergency Clause Adopted - AYES: 26 NOES: 6 PRESENT: 0
On April 7, 2022 in the House:
- Reported to the House with... - SS SCS, as amended.
On April 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Scheduled - Thursday, April 7, 2022, 9:00 a.m., Senate Committee Room 1.
- Referred: Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight
- SS Adopted - as amended
- SS Offered
- Taken Up for Third Reading
On April 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held
- Voted Do Pass
- Reported Do Pass
On March 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Scheduled - Monday, April 4, 2022, 3:00 p.m., Senate Lounge.
On March 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred: Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight
On March 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- SCS Reported Do Pass
On March 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- SCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Held
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On February 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - 1:00 p.m., Tuesday, February 22, 2022, SCR 1
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Agriculture, Food Production and Outdoor Resources
On January 27, 2022 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 6 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 120 NOES: 30 PRESENT: 1
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Emergency Clause Adopted - AYES: 110 NOES: 31 PRESENT: 11
On January 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On January 26, 2022 in the House:
- Referred: Fiscal Review
On January 25, 2022 in the House:
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1, adopted
- HCS Adopted
- Title of Bill - Agreed To
- Taken Up for Perfection
On January 13, 2022 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 11 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
On January 12, 2022 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 1
On January 11, 2022 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On January 10, 2022 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 6, 2022 in the House:
- Referred: Agriculture Policy
- Read Second Time
On January 5, 2022 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 1, 2021 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendments (18)
4074H.09S
Passed
4074H09.1HR
Adopted
4074H09.02F
Distributed
4074S07.01F
Distributed
4074S07.19S
Adopted
4074S07.16S
Moot
4074S07.14S
Withdrawn
4074S07.13S
Adopted
4074S07.05S
Adopted, as amended
4074S07.09S
Adopted
4074S07.02S
Adopted
4074S07.12S
Adopted
4074S07.11S
Adopted
4074S.07F
Adopted, as amended
4074H02.11H
Distributed
4074H02.10H
Distributed
4074H02.09H
Distributed
4074H02.06H
Adopted
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor