+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On May 9, 2019 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On May 6, 2019 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On May 2, 2019 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
- Public Hearing Completed
On April 18, 2019 in the House:
- Referred: Special Committee on Tourism
On January 10, 2019 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 9, 2019 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 3, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor