+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (51)
On June 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved by Governor
- Delivered to Secretary of State
On May 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by President Pro Tem
- Delivered to Governor
On May 25, 2016 in the House:
- Constitutional Objection Filed
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 13, 2016 in the House:
- Taken Up
- House Adopts - SS#2 AYES: 137 NOES: 13 PRESENT: 0
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 137 NOES: 11 PRESENT: 0
- Emergency Clause Adopted on Truly Agreed to Bill - AYES: 121 NOES: 28 PRESENT: 1
- House Message
On May 12, 2016 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
- Reported Do Pass
On May 11, 2016 in the House:
- Reported to the House with... - SS#2 as amended
- Referred: Fiscal Review
On May 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Taken Up
- SS Withdrawn
- Senate Substitute Offered
- SS Adopted
- Third Read and Passed with Amendments - SA 1 AYES: 31 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
- Emergency Clause Adopted - AYES: 27 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Taken Up
- Senate Substitute Offered
- Placed on Informal Calendar
On April 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar
On April 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
- Executive Session Held - Voted do pass
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
- Second read and referred: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy, and the Environment
On March 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Tuesday, March 29, 2016, 3:00pm, Senate Lounge
On February 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy, and the Environment
On February 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Taken Up
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 146 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 1
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Taken Up
- HCS Adopted
- Perfected
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- HCS Voted Do Pass
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass with Amendments - HCA 1 AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Referred: Select Committee on Agriculture
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass with Amendments
On January 12, 2016 in the House:
- Referred: Conservation and Natural Resources
On January 7, 2016 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 6, 2016 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 10, 2015 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendments (2)
5192S06.01F
Distributed
5192H01.01H
Distributed