+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (22)
On May 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Held
On April 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Tuesday, April 26, 2016, 8:15am, SCR 1
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate Seniors, Families, and Children
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 11, 2016 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 152 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
- Taken Up
On April 5, 2016 in the House:
- Perfected
- Taken Up
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Referred: Select Committee on Judiciary
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 14, 2016 in the House:
- Referred: Civil and Criminal Proceedings
On January 7, 2016 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 6, 2016 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 10, 2015 in the House:
- Prefiled