+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 27, 2012 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
On February 20, 2012 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 15, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Special Standing Committee on Disability Services
On February 13, 2012 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 9, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor