+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On April 10, 2018 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On April 9, 2018 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 28, 2018 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On March 26, 2018 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education
On January 4, 2018 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 3, 2018 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 20, 2017 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor