+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On May 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Jobs, Economic Development, and Local Government
On May 3, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On May 3, 2012 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Reported Do Pass
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 123 NOES: 21
On May 2, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Fiscal Review
On May 1, 2012 in the House:
- HCS Adopted
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1, HA 2, HA 3, HA 4 ADOPTED
On April 12, 2012 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On April 4, 2012 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
On April 3, 2012 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- HCS Voted Do Pass
On March 6, 2012 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 22, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Economic Development
On February 13, 2012 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 9, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor