+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On April 25, 2012 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On April 4, 2012 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On March 21, 2012 in the House:
- Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard
On March 6, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Judiciary
On February 13, 2012 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 9, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor