+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On July 6, 2013 in the House:
- Referred: Education
On April 28, 2004 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On April 20, 2004 in the House:
- 4/20/2004
On April 15, 2004 in the House:
- Referred: Transportation and Motor Vehicles
On March 31, 2004 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On March 30, 2004 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time