+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (46)
On July 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Secretary of State
- Approved by Governor
On May 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 25, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 10, 2016 in the House:
- House Message
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 111 NOES: 43 PRESENT: 0
- House Adopts - SCS AYES: 111 NOES: 41 PRESENT: 0
- Taken Up
On April 27, 2016 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On April 25, 2016 in the House:
- Referred: Fiscal Review
- Reported to the House with... - SCS
On April 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 27 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
- SCS Adopted
- Taken Up
- Reported Do Pass
On April 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - Voted do pass
On April 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred: Senate Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- SCS Reported Do Pass
- Executive Session Held
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Wednesday, April 6, 2016, noon or upon noon recess, Senate Lounge
On March 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate Jobs, Economic Development, and Local Government
On March 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 14, 2016 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 112 NOES: 38 PRESENT: 1
- Taken Up
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 10, 2016 in the House:
- Referred: Fiscal Review
On March 9, 2016 in the House:
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1 and HA 2 adopted
- Taken Up
On February 18, 2016 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Referred: Select Committee on Commerce
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 12 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On February 10, 2016 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 14, 2016 in the House:
- Referred: Trade and Tourism
On January 7, 2016 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 6, 2016 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 9, 2015 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (3)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor