+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (48)
On June 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Secretary of State
- Approved by Governor
On May 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 25, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 12, 2016 in the House:
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 142 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 0
- House Adopts - SCS AYES: 142 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 0
- Taken Up
- Reported Do Pass
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On May 11, 2016 in the House:
- Reported to the House with... - SCS
- Referred: Fiscal Review
On May 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 30 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- SCS Adopted
- Taken Up
On May 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Placed on Informal Calendar
- Reported Do Pass
On April 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - voted do pass
On April 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Scheduled - Wednesday, April 27, 2016, 2:00pm, SCR 1
On April 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred: Senate Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight
On April 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- SCS Reported Do Pass
- Executive Session Held
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On March 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Tuesday, April 5, 2016, 8:15am, Senate Committee Room 1
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate Seniors, Families, and Children
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 7, 2016 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 145 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
- Taken Up
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 3, 2016 in the House:
- Referred: Fiscal Review
On March 2, 2016 in the House:
- Perfected
- HCS Adopted
- Taken Up
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Referred: Select Committee on Social Services
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On January 26, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 14, 2016 in the House:
- Referred: Children and Families
On January 7, 2016 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 6, 2016 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 9, 2015 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendments (2)
4300H02.01H
Distributed
4300H02.02H
Distributed
+ − Votes (3)
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor