+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 30, 2012 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - VOTED DO PASS
- Public Hearing Held
On April 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - WEDNESDAY, APRIL 26, 5:00PM, OR UPON NEXT OCCURING RECESS OF THE SENATE, SENATE LOUNGE
On April 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Hearing Cancelled
On April 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - MONDAY, APRIL 23, UPON ADJOURNMENT, SENATE LOUNGE
On April 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Second Read and Referred: Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence
On March 29, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On March 28, 2012 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 148 NOES: 0
On March 27, 2012 in the House:
- Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules
On March 20, 2012 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Rules - Reported Do Pass - Consent
On February 28, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
- Reported Do Pass by Consent
- Voted Do Pass - Consent
- Executive Session Completed
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 15, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: Elections
On February 9, 2012 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 8, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time