+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On May 1, 2012 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On April 16, 2012 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25
On April 12, 2012 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
On March 27, 2012 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 23, 2012 in the House:
- Referred: General Laws
On February 9, 2012 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On February 8, 2012 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor