+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (18)
On April 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate General Laws
On April 22, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 17, 2014 in the House:
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 129 NOES: 19
On April 15, 2014 in the House:
- Taken Up for Perfection
- HCS Adopted
- Perfected
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- Rules - Executive Session Completed
- Rules - Voted Do Pass
- Rules - Reported Do Pass
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- HCS Reported Do Pass
- Referred: Rules
On March 11, 2014 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On February 11, 2014 in the House:
- Referred: General Laws
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Introduced and Read First Time
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor