+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (19)
On May 9, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar
On May 5, 2022 in the House:
- Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar
On April 25, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar
On April 21, 2022 in the House:
- Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar
On April 4, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar
On March 24, 2022 in the House:
- Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar
On February 24, 2022 in the House:
- Executive Session Completed
- Voted Do Pass
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On February 8, 2022 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 6 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 1, 2022 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 27, 2022 in the House:
- Referred: Public Safety
On January 6, 2022 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 5, 2022 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 1, 2021 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendments (13)
3495H01.18H
Distributed
3495H01.17H
Distributed
3495H01.13H
Distributed
3495H01.11H
Distributed
3495H01.12H
Distributed
3495H01.10H
Distributed
3495H01.09H
Distributed
3495H01.08H
Distributed
3495H01.07H
Distributed
3495H01.06H
Distributed
3495H01.03H
Distributed
3495H01.02H
Distributed
3495H01.01H
Distributed
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor