+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Wednesday, April 27, 2022, 8:30 a.m., Senate Lounge.
On April 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Commerce, Consumer Protection, Energy and the Environment
On April 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 6, 2022 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 101 NOES: 40 PRESENT: 1
- Taken Up for Third Reading
- Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar
On March 30, 2022 in the House:
- Perfected
- Title of Bill - Agreed To
- Taken Up for Perfection
On March 22, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar
On March 1, 2022 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 9 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
On February 28, 2022 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 10, 2022 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On January 26, 2022 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 19, 2022 in the House:
- Public Hearing Continued
On January 6, 2022 in the House:
- Referred: Utilities
- Read Second Time
On January 5, 2022 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 1, 2021 in the House:
- Prefiled