+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On May 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On April 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Monday, May 2, 2022, 1:00 p.m., Senate Committee Room 1.
On April 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Local Government and Elections
On April 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On April 6, 2022 in the House:
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 102 NOES: 36 PRESENT: 4
- Taken Up for Third Reading
On March 30, 2022 in the House:
- Perfected with Amendments - HA 1, HA 1 to HA 2, HA 2, as amended, adopted.
- HCS Adopted
- Title of Bill - Agreed To
- Taken Up for Perfection
On March 23, 2022 in the House:
- Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar
On March 10, 2022 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 10 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
On March 8, 2022 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On March 3, 2022 in the House:
- Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight
- HCS Reported Do Pass - AYES: 7 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
On March 2, 2022 in the House:
- HCS Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On February 23, 2022 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 27, 2022 in the House:
- Referred: Judiciary
On January 6, 2022 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 5, 2022 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 1, 2021 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor