+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (31)
On June 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Secretary of State
- Approved by Governor
On May 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered to Governor
- Signed by President Pro Tem
On May 25, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by House Speaker
On May 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Senate Message
- Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 30 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
- Taken Up
On April 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported Do Pass-Placed on Third Read Consent Calendar
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Held - Voted do pass Consent
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Executive Session Scheduled - Wednesday, April 6, 2016, 2:00pm, Senate Lounge
On March 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Held
On March 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Public Hearing Scheduled - Wednesday, March 30, 2016, 3:00pm, Senate Lounge
On February 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- Second read and referred: Senate Education
On February 11, 2016 in the House:
- Taken Up
- Third Read and Passed - AYES: 146 NOES: 7 PRESENT: 0
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported to the Senate and First Read
On February 9, 2016 in the House:
- Perfected
- Taken Up
On February 4, 2016 in the House:
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- Referred: Select Committee on General Laws
- Reported Do Pass - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
On January 27, 2016 in the House:
- Voted Do Pass
- Executive Session Completed
On January 25, 2016 in the House:
- Public Hearing Completed
On January 14, 2016 in the House:
- Referred: Emerging Issues
On January 7, 2016 in the House:
- Read Second Time
On January 6, 2016 in the House:
- Read First Time
On December 9, 2015 in the House:
- Prefiled
+ − Amendment
5129H01.02H
Distributed
+ − Vote
February 11, 2016: HB 1681
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor